Duff et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Zinn, David Swank, Misty Duff and Chrissy Cox
Defendant: Centene Corporation, Buckeye Community Health Plan, Inc. and Centene Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00750
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Centene Corporation on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (Abaray, Janet)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Centene Management Company, LLC on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (Abaray, Janet)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Buckeye Community Health Plan, Inc. on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (Abaray, Janet)
September 10, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7098267), filed by Misty Duff, Chrissy Cox, David Swank, Kathryn Zinn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abaray, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duff et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Community Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Zinn
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Swank
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Duff
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissy Cox
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?