Cronin v. Kaivac, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Cronin
Defendant: Kaivac, Inc. and Robert S Robinson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00758
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Kaivac, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (rrs)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This civil action is before the Court on Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. (Doc. #10 ). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #7 ) on or before 11/27/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/6/19. (rrs)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/27/2019. by Plaintiff Patrick Cronin. (Wido, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kaivac, Inc.. (bjc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kaivac, Inc.. Green Card not attached to return envelope. (jlw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Kaivac, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Kaivac, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Robinson, Sr., #2 Exhibit A to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #3 Exhibit B to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #4 Exhibit C to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #5 Exhibit D to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #6 Exhibit E to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #7 Exhibit F to the Affidavit of Robert Robinson Sr., #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Sayre, Russell)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kaivac, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendant Kaivac, Inc. (Sayre, Russell)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lawrence Meyer for Defendant Kaivac, Inc. (Meyer, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on September 18, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kaivac, Inc.. (bjc)
September 11, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7100626), filed by Patrick Cronin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Summons Kaivac, #4 Summons Form Summons Robinson) (Wido, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cronin v. Kaivac, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cronin
Represented By: Christopher Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaivac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?