Burns et al v. Wrigley Investment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Burns and Jeremy Burns
Defendant: WRIGLEY INVESTMENTS dba ALLTECH PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC., Jason Lewis and WRIGLEY INVESTMENT, INC. dba ALLTECH PROFESSIONAL SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00762
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Jason Lewis, Wrigley Investment, Inc.. (Gruber, Thomas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jason Lewis, Wrigley Investment, Inc., Wrigley Investments filed by Ohio Department of Medicaid. (McCandlish, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeremy Burns by Defendants Jason Lewis, Wrigley Investment, Inc., Wrigley Investments. (Gruber, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mary Burns by Defendants Jason Lewis, Wrigley Investment, Inc., Wrigley Investments. (Gruber, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERNCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/15/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jason Lewis, Wrigley Investment, Inc., Wrigley Investments. (Gruber, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #4 Waiver of Service Executed Disregard this entry, it was filed incorrectly. Counsel re-filed as document #7 . Clerk restricted document #4 to court users only. (jlw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jason Lewis on 9/10/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Moore, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wrigley Investment, Inc. on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Moore, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wrigley Investments on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Moore, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 *DISREGARD THIS ENTRY IT WAS FILED IN ERROR* WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jason Lewis on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Moore, Daniel) Modified to restrict entry to court users only on 10/15/2019 (jlw).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
September 11, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Plaintiffs Jeremy Burns, Mary Burns. (Moore, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7101694), filed by Mary Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Moore, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns et al v. Wrigley Investment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGLEY INVESTMENTS dba ALLTECH PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGLEY INVESTMENT, INC. dba ALLTECH PROFESSIONAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Burns
Represented By: Daniel N Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?