Richard Goettle, Inc. v. Kevitt Excavating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Goettle, Inc.
Defendant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC d/b/a Kevitt Companies, Granite Re, Inc. and Kevitt Excavating, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00829
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM < filed by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jlw).
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS Kevitt Excavating, LLC's Counterclaim (doc. #10 ) by Counter Defendant Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Busam, Luke) Modified docket text on 11/7/2019 (eh).
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer, #6 MOTION to Transfer Joinder of Reply Memorandum filed by Kevitt in support of its Motion to Transfer, filed by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Richard Goettle, Inc., Goettle Holding Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Goettle Holding Company, Inc. for Richard Goettle, Inc... (Busam, Luke)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ash, Reuel) Modified to clarify docket text on 10/23/2019 (jlw).
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint Defendant Granite Re, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard Goettle, Inc. filed by Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 to Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 to Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit 4 to Counterclaim) (Messer, Earl) Modified on 10/23/2019 (jlw).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather MacGregor Hawkins for Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC. (Hawkins, Heather)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer, #6 MOTION to Transfer filed by Plaintiff Richard Goettle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Busam, Luke)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder ---Joinder of Defendant Kevitt's Motion to Transfer by Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Ash, Reuel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Judicial Caseload Profiles, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order C- Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (Messer, Earl)
October 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines re doc. #5 : Granite Re, Inc. answer due 10/22/2019; Kevitt Excavating, LLC. answer due 10/22/2019. (eh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC.. (Messer, Earl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl K Messer for Defendant Kevitt Excavating, LLC. (Messer, Earl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Richard C. Richmond, III (bjc)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Granite Re, Inc., Kevitt Excavating, LLC., filed by Richard Goettle, Inc. in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case A1904075. (bjc)
October 1, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1904075 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7132812), filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Ash, Reuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Goettle, Inc. v. Kevitt Excavating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC d/b/a Kevitt Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: Reuel D Ash
Represented By: Jesse R Lipcius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevitt Excavating, LLC.
Represented By: Heather MacGregor Hawkins
Represented By: Earl K Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Goettle, Inc.
Represented By: Luke John Busam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?