WRIGHT v. GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KYLE WRIGHT
Defendant: JOSHUA LANSDALE, GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC, John Doe 1-10, Jane Doe 1-10, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00885
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Kyle Wright. (Spencer, Christina)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Oldham, Douglas)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Palmer. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/24/19. (wam)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hollingsworth for Plaintiff Kyle Wright (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7167086) of Michael P. Palmer by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Oldham, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Appendix Certificate of good standing) (wam).
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale re #5 Complaint Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Oldham, Douglas)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
October 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: General Engine Products, LLC answer due 11/15/2019; Joshua Lansdale answer due 11/15/2019. (jlw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Wright. Filed in Warren County Court of Common Pleas on 9/17/2019 (jlw)
October 21, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Oldham, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD by Defendants GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC, JOSHUA LANSDALE. (Oldham, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Oldham for Defendants GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC, JOSHUA LANSDALE (Oldham, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV092613 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7160570), filed by JOSHUA LANSDALE, GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of State Court Filings on Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oldham, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE WRIGHT
Represented By: Jonathan Hollingsworth
Represented By: Christina M Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA LANSDALE
Represented By: Douglas M. Oldham
Represented By: Michael P. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Oldham
Represented By: Michael P. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?