Reynolds v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Robert Reynolds
Defendant: C.O. Evans and C.O. Hutchinson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00952
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Reynolds. (cb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to pay $400 ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) or submit to the Court an in forma pauperis application and certified copy of plaintiffs prison trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six-month period within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/14/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evans, Hutchinson, filed by Robert Reynolds (Scanned as received without IFP Form, Summons Forms, USM-285 Forms, or Service Copies of the Complaint). (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 11/13/2019 (bjc). Modified on 11/13/2019 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?