H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Robo et al
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Miranda Robo and Madalena Robo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00961
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Madalena Robo and Miranda Robo by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. (cb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Miranda Robo (Gustavson, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Madalena Robo (Gustavson, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN038043. (cb)
November 13, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Robo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Robo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madalena Robo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?