H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Rimbey
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Scott Rimbey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00962
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Scott Rimbey. Scott Rimbey served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Gustavson, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scott Rimbey by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. (cb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Scott Rimbey (Gustavson, William)
November 13, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Rimbey ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7195176), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Rimbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rimbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?