Brown v. Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office et al
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Defendant: Carla Dreyer, Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer, Matthew Matin, Katherine Pridemore, James Bogan, Partick T. Dinkelacker, City of Cincinnati/Police Department, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Michael Fern, Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Mckinley Brown, Robert Winkler, Seth Tieger, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks, Jerome Stineman, County Sheriff Jim Neil, Mike Drexelius, Joseph Deters, Adelaida Fernandez, Court Clinic/Central Clinic and Matthew Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00969
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, Joseph Deters, Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Katherine Pridemore, Seth Tieger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sayre, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit F2) (Brown, Terry) Modified to correct docket text on 1/3/2020 (sct).
January 2, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C4) (Brown, Terry) Modified to correct docket text on 1/3/2020 (sct).
January 2, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C3) (Brown, Terry) Modified to correct docket text on 1/3/2020 (sct).
January 2, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C2) (Brown, Terry) Modified to correct docket text on 1/3/2020 (sct).
January 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (Brown, Terry) Modified to correct docket text on 1/3/2020 (sct).
January 2, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B2) (Brown, Terry)
January 2, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Partick T. Dinkelacker. (Upton, Lindsay)
December 31, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Robert Winkler. (Ranttila, Kelly)
December 31, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #38 Response to Motion, This entry was filed in error. Counsel was notified and will re-file using Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and RepliesReply to Response to Motion.. Clerk restricted entry to court users only. (jlw)
December 30, 2019 Filing 38 *PLEASE DISREGARD, THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN ERROR* RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Robert Winkler. (Ranttila, Kelly) Modified to restrict entry to court users only on 12/31/2019 (jlw).
December 30, 2019 Filing 37 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jerome Stineman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terry Brown's Financial Disclosure/Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Exhibit B - Jerome Stineman's Motion to Withdraw as Private Counsel for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Motion for New Counsel filed by Plaintiff) (Brick, Timothy)
December 27, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE to pro-se plaintiff regarding filing a response to defendants' #34 MOTION TO DISMISS. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 24, 2019 Filing 35 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Adelaida Fernandez, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks. (Jama, Valerie)
December 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants City of Cincinnati/Police Department, Mike Drexelius, Michael Fern, Matthew Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Manning, Mark)
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Brown, Terry)
December 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Robert Patrick Manning for Defendants City of Cincinnati/Police Department, Mike Drexelius, Michael Fern, Matthew Martin (Manning, Mark)
December 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie D Jama for Defendants Adelaida Fernandez, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks (Jama, Valerie)
December 16, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Brown, Terry)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Access CM/ECF Electronic Online Filing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/10/2019. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jerome Stineman answer due 12/30/2019. (art)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE to pro-se plaintiff regarding filing a response to defendant Dinkelacker's #21 MOTION TO DISMISS. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTATION ORDER granting defendant Stineman's #19 Motion for Extension of (21) days until 12/30/2019 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/10/2019. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi R. Laser Seskes for Defendant Robert Winkler (Laser Seskes, Brandi)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE to pro-se plaintiff regarding filing a response to defendant Winkler's #24 MOTION to Dismiss. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Robert Winkler. (Ranttila, Kelly)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey John Boucher for Defendant Robert Winkler (Boucher, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Michael Fern served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Matthew Martin served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (eh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Partick T. Dinkelacker. (Upton, Lindsay)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Zaring for Defendant Partick T. Dinkelacker (Zaring, Lisa)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/2/2020. by Defendant Jerome Stineman. (Brick, Timothy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy T Brick for Defendant Jerome Stineman (Brick, Timothy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 County Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, Joseph Deters, Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Katherine Pridemore, Seth Tieger. (Sayre, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Sayre for Defendants James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, Joseph Deters, Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Katherine Pridemore, Seth Tieger (Sayre, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cooper D Bowen for Defendants James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, Joseph Deters, Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Katherine Pridemore, Seth Tieger (Bowen, Cooper)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mike Drexelius. Mike Drexelius served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (bjc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer. (Mann, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Mann for Defendant Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer (Mann, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security. Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security served on 11/16/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (jlw)
December 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines re doc. #10 : Adelaida Fernandez answer due 12/30/2019; Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks answer due 12/30/2019. (eh) Modified on 12/3/2019 (eh).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER granting defendants Summit Behavioral Healthcare, Elizabeth Banks, and Dr. Adelaida Fernandez's #9 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/30/2019 to file a response to plaintiff's complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/2/2019. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/30/2019. by Defendants Adelaida Fernandez, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks. (Tendam, Morgan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Leigh Tendam for Defendants Adelaida Fernandez, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks (Tendam, Morgan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Partick T. Dinkelacker, Carla Dreyer, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks. Partick T. Dinkelacker served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Carla Dreyer served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (jlw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer, Joseph Deters, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Katherine Pridemore, Jerome Stineman, Seth Tieger, Robert Winkler. James Bogan served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Mckinley Brown served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Joseph Deters served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Katherine Pridemore served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Jerome Stineman served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Seth Tieger served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Robert Winkler served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (jlw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to County Sheriff Jim Neil. (jlw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on November 15, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Access CM/ECF Electronic Online Filing System by Plaintiff Terry Brown. (jlw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Bogan, Mckinley Brown, City of Cincinnati/Police Department, County Sheriff Jim Neil, Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer, Joseph Deters, Partick T. Dinkelacker, Mike Drexelius, Carla Dreyer, Michael Fern, Adelaida Fernandez(Doctor), Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security, Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office, Matthew Matin, Katherine Pridemore, Jerome Stineman, Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks, Seth Tieger, Robert Winkler. (jlw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Terry Brown. (jlw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (jlw).
November 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN038055 (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Dreyer
Represented By: Michael T Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court Clinic/Central Clinic & Carla Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Matin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Pridemore
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bogan
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partick T. Dinkelacker
Represented By: Lisa Marie Zaring
Represented By: Lindsay M. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cincinnati/Police Department
Represented By: Mark Robert Patrick Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County, Ohio/Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fern
Represented By: Mark Robert Patrick Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Cincinnati Fusion Center/Homeland Security
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mckinley Brown
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Winkler
Represented By: Kelly E. Ranttila
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Represented By: Jeffrey John Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Tieger
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Behavioral Healthcare/Elizabeth Banks
Represented By: Valerie D Jama
Represented By: Morgan Leigh Tendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Stineman
Represented By: Mohammad Salman Shah
Represented By: Timothy T Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Sheriff Jim Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Drexelius
Represented By: Mark Robert Patrick Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Deters
Represented By: James S. Sayre
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelaida Fernandez
Represented By: Valerie D Jama
Represented By: Morgan Leigh Tendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court Clinic/Central Clinic
Represented By: Michael T Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Martin
Represented By: Mark Robert Patrick Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?