Olilla v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Joan Olilla
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01095
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Columbus as case number 2:20-cv-19. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:20-cv-19. (jlw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, filed by Joan Olilla. Filed in Jefferson County Court of Common Pleas on 12/2/2019 as case number 19cv536 (jlw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Dean G. Makricostas (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case was erroneously filed in federal court in Cincinnati, Ohio, instead of Columbus, Ohio, both of which are in the Southern District of Ohio. Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of this Court to TRANSFER this action to the Columbus Division of this District and to place it in the random draw deck of that Court. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 12/31/2019. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Resetar, Nicholas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Court of Common Pleas, OH, case number 19CV536 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7261054), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Resetar, Nicholas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Companies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. (Resetar, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olilla v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Pavel Resetar
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Sloan
Represented By: Tyler Martin Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Olilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?