Allen et al v. Horter Investment Management, LLC
Plaintiff: John W. McCormick, Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr. and Betty L. Puthoff
Defendant: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Nekvasil, Kalju)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators MOTION to Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #1 Complaint, (Reply in Support of Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC's Motion to Stay Litigation [ECF Doc. # 7]) filed by Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC. (Fornshell, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 00000000. (Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time in which to (1) Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint [ECF Doc. #1], and (2) File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay, or Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators [ECF Doc. # 3]) filed by Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC. (Fornshell, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Rene Woods for Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC (Woods, Nicole)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Lambert, Marnie) Modified to remove filing date on 2/14/2020 (jlw).
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators MOTION to Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3) (Lambert, Marnie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 [FORMER DOC. 10 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.] NOTICE by Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC re #7 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators MOTION to Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #1 Complaint, [Notice of Correction to Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay Litigation] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Stay, #2 Errata B to Motion to Stay) (Fornshell, Matthew) Modified docket text and document security on 1/23/2020 (eh).
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay, or Alternatively, for Appointment of Arbitrators served on Horter Investment Management, LLC on January 10, 2020, filed by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Nekvasil, Kalju)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 00000000. by Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Extension of Time) (Fornshell, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators MOTION to Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Horter Investment Management, LLC. (Fornshell, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2020: #4 Ex. A-C) (eh). Modified to correct Exhibits on 1/23/2020 (eh).
January 23, 2020 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 10] - Restricted for PDF error. Exhibits attached individually to docs. #7 and #10 would not open with headers. Clerk combined the pdfs, reattached them to doc. #7 , and regenerated the NEF. (eh)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kalju Nekvasil for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/16/2020. (ba)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7267821) of Kalju Nekvasil and Attached Certificate of Good Standing (Lambert, Marnie)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Horter Investment Management, LLC. (eh)
January 7, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion for Appointment of Arbitrators by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 10) (Lambert, Marnie). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Appoint Counsel on 1/7/2020 (eh).
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7267821) of Kalju Nekvasil by Plaintiffs Linda L. Allen, Donald L. Engle, Jr, John W. McCormick, Betty L. Puthoff. (Lambert, Marnie)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7267794), filed by Betty L. Puthoff, Linda L. Allen, John W. McCormick, Donald L. Engle, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 17, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Lambert, Marnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Horter Investment Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. McCormick
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Kalju Nekvasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Allen
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Kalju Nekvasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Engle, Jr.
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Kalju Nekvasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L. Puthoff
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Kalju Nekvasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?