Accor Management US Inc. v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Accor Management US Inc.
Defendant: Donald Neufeld, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II and Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Deputy Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00040
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (vp)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Accor Management US Inc. (Svirnovskiy, Simon)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/21/2020. (jlw)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bjc)
January 17, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES ACT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Donald Neufeld, filed by Accor Management US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Svirnovskiy, Simon)
January 15, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7282698 (sct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accor Management US Inc. v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accor Management US Inc.
Represented By: Simon Svirnovskiy
Represented By: Matthew O Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Deputy Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?