Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. v. New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.
Plaintiff: Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.
Defendant: New Richmond Development Corp., LLC. and Commercial Liability Partners, LLC
Interested Party: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00091
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties Filed by Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Rule 26(f) report) (Newman, Justin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.. (Fay, T.)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Michalski for Defendants Commercial Liability Partners, LLC, New Richmond Development Corp., LLC. (Michalski, David)
March 20, 2020 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/10/2020. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.. (Newman, Justin)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Responses due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/2/20. (ba)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/13/2020. by Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.. (Weber, James)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Attend the February 27, 2020 Discovery Status Conference by Interested Party Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pieczonka, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Pieczonka for Interested Party Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. (Pieczonka, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - Please be aware that the telephone discovery conference set for 2/27/20 is VACATED at this time. (ba)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/21/20. (Attachments: #1 PI Attachment) (ba)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Commercial Liability Partners, LLC, New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1 - Environmental Liability and Property Transfer and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit - 2 - NRDC Public Delaware Incorporation Date, #3 Exhibit - 3 - Electronic Articles of Organization for Florida Limited Liability Company, #4 Exhibit - 4 - NRDC Auditor Report for Parcel ID 272802C006) (Musekamp, George)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin George Sandlin for Defendants Commercial Liability Partners, LLC, New Richmond Development Corp., LLC. (Sandlin, Benjamin)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Musekamp for Defendant New Richmond Development Corp., LLC. (Musekamp, George)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Weber for Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. (Weber, James)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.. (Newman, Justin)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Derek Newman for Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. (Newman, Justin)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis David Altman for Plaintiff Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. (Altman, Dennis)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Commercial Liability Partners, LLC, New Richmond Development Corp., LLC., filed by Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. in The Clermont County Court of Common Pleas Case 2019CVH1571. (bjc)
February 3, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.. (Fay, T.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clermont County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CVH1571 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7311777), filed by New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. - Complaint and Summons) (Fay, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc. v. New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Richmond Development Corp., LLC.
Represented By: T. Michael Fay
Represented By: George B. Musekamp
Represented By: Benjamin George Sandlin
Represented By: David J Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Liability Partners, LLC
Represented By: George B. Musekamp
Represented By: Benjamin George Sandlin
Represented By: T. Michael Fay,
Represented By: David J Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighbors Opposing Pit Expansion, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Derek Newman
Represented By: Dennis David Altman
Represented By: James Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?