Continental Casualty Company v. Geotechnical Consultants, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY and Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: JACK A. HAMILTON & ASSOCIATES, INC., GEOTECHNICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY a/s/o LAUREL HEALTH CARE HOLDINGS and PAG'S EXCAVATING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00104
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Kristen E Campbell substituting for Edmond Mack and Brandon McHugh as to Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc.. (Campbell, Kristen)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order: Upon review of the updated notice of substitution of counsel for Defendant Pag's Excavating (Doc. #15 ), the Court finds that the notice complies with S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 83.4(c)(3). Accordingly, Attorneys Edmond J. Mack and Brandon W. McHugh of the law firm of Tzangas Plakas Mannos, Ltd. shall be TERMINATED from the docket, and the docket shall reflect the appearance of Kristen E. Campbell Traub of the law firm Pelini, Campbell & Williams LLC as counsel for Defendant Pag's Excavating. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/3/2020. (rrs)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc.. (jlw)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This civil matter is before the Court on the notice of substitution of counsel for Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc. filed by Kristen E. Campbell Traub of the law firm Pelini, Campbell & Williams LLC in substitution of Attorneys Edmond J. Mack and Brandon W. McHugh of the law firm of Tzangas Plakas Mannos, Ltd. (Doc. #13 ). S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 83.4(c)(3) permits counsel to withdraw by filing a notice signed by (1) the current, withdrawing trial attorney; (2) the client; and (3) a new, substituting trial attorney. The instant notice of substitution is deficient, as it is not signed by the withdrawing attorneys or the client. Accordingly, counsel for Pag's Excavating, Inc. shall file an amended notice of substitution or a motion to withdraw as counsel in accordance with S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 83.4(c)(2) or (c)(3) by 4/15/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/30/2020. (rrs)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Kristen E Campbell substituting for Edmond J. Mack, Brandon W. McHugh and the law firm of Tzangas Plakas Mannos, Ltd. as to Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc.. (Campbell, Kristen)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Geotechnical Consultants, Inc.. (Marlin, James)
March 25, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
March 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pag's Excavating, Inc. answer due 4/17/2020. (jlw)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmond J. Mack for Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc. (Mack, Edmond)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jack A. Hamilton & Associates, Inc. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (eh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc.. (McHugh, Brandon)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. McHugh for Defendant Pag's Excavating, Inc. (McHugh, Brandon)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jack A. Hamilton & Associates, Inc.. (Blatt, Shawn)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on March 2, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Geotechnical Consultants, Inc., Jack A. Hamilton & Associates, Inc., Pag's Excavating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form) (jlw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Geotechnical Consultants, Inc. (Alexandersen, kevin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. PAG's Excavating, Inc. (Alexandersen, kevin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Jack A. Hamilton & Associates, Inc. (Alexandersen, kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEOTECHNICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., JACK A. HAMILTON & ASSOCIATES, INC., PAG'S EXCAVATING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7323217), filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alexandersen, kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. Geotechnical Consultants, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK A. HAMILTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Shawn Michael Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOTECHNICAL CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: James Joseph Marlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY a/s/o LAUREL HEALTH CARE HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAG'S EXCAVATING, INC.
Represented By: Brandon W. McHugh
Represented By: Kristen E Campbell
Represented By: Edmond J. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY
Represented By: kevin Carl Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Brooke Leigh Hamilton
Represented By: kevin Carl Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?