In re: Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati
Debtor In Possession: Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Appellee: Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Appellant: UMWA 1993 Benefit Plan and UMWA 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv00267
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7471362) of Michael Vatis and Johanna Dennehy by Appellants UMWA 1974 Pension Plan and Trust, UMWA 1993 Benefit Plan. (Schaeffer, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Corcoran for Appellee Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC (Corcoran, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alan Coutinho for Appellee Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC (Coutinho, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick L Ashton for Appellee Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC (Ashton, Rick)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Vincent Cavalieri and Matthew Thomas Schaeffer for Appellants UMWA 1974 Pension Plan and Trust, UMWA 1993 Benefit Plan (Schaeffer, Matthew) Modified to add additional counsel on 5/19/2020 (sct).
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 6/12/2020. Appellee Brief due by 7/12/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Hearing Transcript of 2-14-20, #2 Hearing Transcript of 3-12-20) (er) (Main Document & Attachments replaced on 5/13/2020) (er). Modified to correct dates on 5/15/2020 (sct).
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-10390. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Doc 124, #4 Doc 270, #5 Doc 280, #6 Doc 281) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: MaryAnne Wilsbacher
Represented By: Monica Villarejos Kindt
Represented By: Benjamin A. Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Alan Coutinho
Represented By: Matthew M. Zofchak
Represented By: Richard Keith Stovall
Represented By: Thomas Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Murray Metallurgical Coal Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Alan Coutinho
Represented By: Matthew M. Zofchak
Represented By: Richard Keith Stovall
Represented By: Thomas Richard Allen
Represented By: Rick L Ashton
Represented By: Jeffrey R Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UMWA 1993 Benefit Plan
Represented By: Nick Vincent Cavalieri
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UMWA 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
Represented By: Nick Vincent Cavalieri
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?