Weathers v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: Lula Weathers
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd, Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company and The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00319
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-05574, filed 05/06/2020. (er)
May 5, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 5/5/2020; certified by the Clerk's Office, District of NJ on 5/5/2020. (er)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 5/5/2020. (er)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/1/2020 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/29/2020. (rrs)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Procter & Gamble Company and Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company by Plaintiff Lula Weathers in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Proctor & Gamble Company in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Abbott Laboratories in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654.. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654.. (bjc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Proctor & Gamble Company, Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by Lula Weathers in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case A1902654. (bjc)
April 23, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation. (Anderson, Daniel)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (Anderson, Daniel)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902654 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7433835), filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP, Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-2 Answer of Takeda Defendants, #3 Exhibit A-3 Answer of Abbott Laboratories, #4 Exhibit A-4 Answer of Procter & Gamble, #5 Exhibit A-5 Answer of Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Co., #6 Exhibit A-6 Answer of AstraZeneca Defendants, #7 Exhibit A-7 Answer of Merck, #8 Exhibit A-8 Notice of Dismissal of Procter & Gamble Defendants, #9 Exhibit B - JPML Transfer Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weathers v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Weathers
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?