Woodard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carl Woodard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00445
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Until 10/6/2020 in Which to File Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/31/2020. (km)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 10/6/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ochoa, Susana)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/29/20. (ba)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
June 8, 2020 Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/10/2020. (eh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Carl Woodard against Commissioner of Social Security. (eh)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/8/20. (eh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Carl Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form to SSA, #4 Summons Form to Atty General, #5 Summons Form to U.S. Asst. Atty, #6 USM to SSA, #7 USM to Atty General, #8 USM to U.S. Asst. Atty) (Wilson, Rachel) Modified to correct filing event on 6/4/2020 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Woodard
Represented By: Rachel C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?