Guenther v. Life Insurance Co. of North America
Plaintiff: Ms. Cynthia Guenther
Defendant: Life Insurance Co. of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv00548
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 10/13/2020 at 11:00 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/9/2020. (rrs)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Life Insurance Co. of North America. (Srsic, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Set Deadlines re #4 : Life Insurance Co. of North America answer due 9/9/20. (eh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendant Life Insurance Co. of North America. (Srsic, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Co. of North America. (eh)
July 16, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7555677), filed by Cynthia Guenther. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ahlers, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Life Insurance Co. of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Cynthia Guenther
Represented By: Edward Christopher Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Co. of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?