Ryan v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Robert Ryan
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company and The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00556
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company. (Weigand, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company, Procter & Gamble Company identifying Corporate Parent Procter & Gamble Company for The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company.. (Weigand, Stephen)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company, filed by Robert Ryan. (Raper, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W Palmer for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company (Palmer, Jason)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. (Weigand, Stephen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A Weigand for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company (Weigand, Stephen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Procter & Gamble Company. (eh)
July 17, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Procter & Gamble Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7559022), filed by Robert Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Raper, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Stephen A Weigand
Represented By: Jason W Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble U.S. Business Services Company
Represented By: Stephen A Weigand
Represented By: Jason W Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ryan
Represented By: Robert L. Raper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?