Arnold v. Paul Brown Stadium LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Arnold
Defendant: Paul Brown Stadium LTD. and The Santangelo Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00558
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz.. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/31/20. (ba)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT (JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN) by Defendant Paul Brown Stadium LTD.. (Wagner, John)
August 26, 2020 Set Deadlines: The Santangelo Group, Inc. answer to cross-claim due 9/18/2020. (eh)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Stipulation filed by The Santangelo Group, Inc.; The Santangelo Group, Inc., shall respond to Paul Brown Stadiums Ltd's Crossclaim by 9/18/20. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/25/20. (ba)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Agreed Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Cross-Claim by Defendant The Santangelo Group, Inc.. (Dunn, John) Modified docket text on 8/24/2020 (eh).
August 8, 2020 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/31/2020. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Complaint filed by The Santangelo Group, Inc.. (Dunn, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Dunn for Defendant The Santangelo Group, Inc. (Dunn, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against The Santangelo Group, Inc. filed by Paul Brown Stadium LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cross-Claim - License Agreement) (Wagner, John)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/23/20. (ba)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Jeri Barclay Poppe, Nicholas R. Hart, and Sarah L. Clark (bjc)
July 20, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/14/2020 in Jefferson Circuit Court, Kentucky (Case No. 20-CI-002938) by Derrick Arnold against Paul Brown Stadium LTD., The Santangelo Group, Inc. (eh)
July 17, 2020 Judge Michael R. Barrett added. (er)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00435. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/17/2020 granting #8 Proposed Agreed Order. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Ohio. All motions pending in the Western District of Kentucky are hereby MOOT. cc: Counsel; USDC Clerk, OHSD (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order to Transfer Venue by Paul Brown Stadium LTD.. (Wagner, John) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Wagner on behalf of Paul Brown Stadium LTD. (Wagner, John) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance) by The Santangelo Group, Inc.. (Hart, Nicholas) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Santangelo Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Hart, Nicholas) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Cicuit Court (DLW) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DLW) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Santangelo Group, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-002938. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3122536), filed by The Santangelo Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #4 Exhibit State Circuit Court Docket) (DLW) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Paul Brown Stadium LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Arnold
Represented By: Jeri Barclay Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Brown Stadium LTD.
Represented By: John D. Wagner
Represented By: Colleen Marie Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Santangelo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah L. Clark
Represented By: Nicholas R. Hart
Represented By: John M Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?