Milton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven Milton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00631
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/18/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sorkin, Adam)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 08/27/2020. (bjc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/19/2020. (km)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Steven Milton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/18/2020. (km)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Milton. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USDC Form) (Walter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Milton
Represented By: Robert Christopher Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?