In Re: Rodney Thomas Riddle
Appellant: Rodney Thomas Riddle
Appellee: Mark A Greenberger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00662
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #2 Report and Recommendations by Appellant Rodney Thomas Riddle. (bjc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File objections re #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Rodney Thomas Riddle Responses due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/17/2020. (wam)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Rodney Thomas Riddle. New date requested 9/28/2020. (kl)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rodney Thomas Riddle. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/2/2020. (km)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT.Bankruptcy Court case number 19-8022, filed by Rodney Thomas Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bjc) (Case Received as scanned without fee or Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis). Modified docket text on 8/26/2020 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Rodney Thomas Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rodney Thomas Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark A Greenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?