The Cincinnati Enquirer v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Enquirer
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Drug Enforcement Administration and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2020cv00758
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 12/7/2020 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Continue the PPTC from 11/18/2020 until 12/7/2020 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. The parties are to use the same dial in information as previously provided. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/16/2020. (wam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Greiner, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration. (King, William)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration. Department of Justice served on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020; Drug Enforcement Administration c/o U. S. Attorney General served on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020 (bjc) Modified on 10/15/2020 (eh).
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (vp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. (bjc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration (Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney's Office - Southern District of Ohio). (bjc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration (King, William)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (kh)
September 23, 2020 Notice of Correction : Please disregard, [FORMER DOC.5] - Incomplete PDF attached. See Doc. #6 for correction. (kl)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kl)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 [FORMER DOC.5 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.] Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration. (kl) Modified docket text and document security on 9/23/2020 (kl).
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren William Ford for Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer (Ford, Darren)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Matthew Schultz for Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer (Schultz, Frank)
September 22, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs The Cincinnati Enquirer, Gannett GP Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gannett GP Media, Inc. for The Cincinnati Enquirer.. (Greiner, John)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7668070), filed by The Cincinnati Enquirer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Request, #2 Exhibit B Denial, #3 Exhibit C Appeal, #4 Exhibit D DOJ Affirmation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Form to U.S. Dept of Justice, #7 Summons Form to U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration) (Greiner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Enquirer v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Enquirer
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Represented By: Frank Matthew Schultz
Represented By: Darren William Ford
Represented By: James Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?