Payne v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Payne
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00763
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 1/22/2021. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Julis, Rachel)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Anthony Payne. (bjc)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 09/25/2020. (bjc)
September 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 11/25/2020. (bjc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1:20-cv-00763 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Anthony Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 SSA Final Decision) (Wagner, Debora) Modified Event type and text to create motion and match lead document on 9/24/2020 (bjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Payne
Represented By: Debora Lynn Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?