Ellis v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Donald Ellis
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company, AstraZeneca LP, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Pfizer Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. f/k/a Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00854
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-17904, filed 12/03/2020. (er)
December 3, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/1/2020; certified by the Clerk's Office District of New Jersey on 12/1/2020. (er)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/1/2020. (er)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/22/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902636) by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/8/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902636) by Pfizer Inc. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/5/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902636) by Abbott Laboratories. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/2/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902636) by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. f/k/a Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/30/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902636) by Donald Ellis against All Defendants. (eh)
November 2, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Pitcairn, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Hamilton County, OH, case number A1902636 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732023), filed by Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Hamilton County Docket, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Order) (Pitcairn, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. f/k/a Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ellis
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?