Klosterman v. Boydston et al
Plaintiff: John Klosterman
Defendant: Konza LLC, Tri State Organization Inc. doing business as Joseph Lentini and Richard Boydston
Case Number: 1:2020cv00878
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff John Klosterman. (bjc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Mason Boydston, Jr (Boydston, Richard)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiff Upon Filing by Defendant(s) of re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Richard Boydston, Konza LLC. (Boydston, Richard)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Richard Boydston, Konza LLC. Richard Boydston served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Konza LLC served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (bjc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (kh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Richard Boydston, Konza LLC, and Tri State Organization Inc. (kh)
November 2, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN040521 (bjc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Boydston, Konza LLC, Tri State Organization Inc., filed by John Klosterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (bjc). Modified To Remove Blank Pages on 11/18/2020 (bjc). Modified To Correct Pages Again on 11/20/2020 (bjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klosterman v. Boydston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Klosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konza LLC
Represented By: Richard Mason Boydston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri State Organization Inc. doing business as Joseph Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Boydston
Represented By: Richard Mason Boydston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?