Ivanoff v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Ivanoff, Brandon Bulger, Scott T. Clark, Celia Williams, Dawn Ament, Mark Blanche, Jr., Shannon McFarland, Shawntrell Washington, Timothy E. Sherer, Deborah Reynolds, Jacob Quill, Justin Marc Williams, Tenika Imaku, Dolores Cunninghma, Debra Bell, Brian Slafter, B J Jones, Nancy Stockwell, Christy Rooker, Rebecca Doolin, Amy Metzinger, Nikole Sutton, Makahla Rutledge, Valerie Tayler, Robert Botterill, Chandra Brooks, Suhel Nazario, Luane Lagreca, Lynette Wakefield, Danielle Thomas, Sarah Kingery, Tony McLemore and Keisha Nelson
Defendant: Walmart Inc., CL Products International, LLC, Luminex Home Decor and Fragrance Company, LLC and Candle-Lite Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00896
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extension of Time for Defendant Walmart Inc. to Move or Plead by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Loving, In Son)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Loving, In Son)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by In Son J. Loving for Defendant Walmart Inc. (Loving, In Son)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William L. Carr and Gene P. Graham as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/14/2020. (eh)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley Scott Waddell, Bryan Turner White, Jack D. McInnes, and Eric Scott Playter as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/14/2020. (eh)
December 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7859182) of William Lewis Carr, Gene P. Graham, Jr. by Plaintiffs Dawn Ament, Debra Bell, Mark Blanche, Jr, Robert Botterill, Chandra Brooks, Brandon Bulger, Scott T. Clark, Dolores Cunninghma, Rebecca Doolin, Tenika Imaku, Amanda Ivanoff, B J Jones, Sarah Kingery, Luane Lagreca, Shannon McFarland, Tony McLemore, Amy Metzinger, Suhel Nazario, Keisha Nelson, Jacob Quill, Deborah Reynolds, Christy Rooker, Makahla Rutledge, Timothy E. Sherer, Brian Slafter, Brian Slafter, Nancy Stockwell, Nikole Sutton, Valerie Tayler, Danielle Thomas, Lynette Wakefield, Shawntrell Washington, Celia Williams, Justin Marc Williams. (Reichenbach, Gregory)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7856789) of Ashley Scott Waddell, Bryan Turner White, Jack D. McInnes, Eric Scott Playter by Plaintiffs Dawn Ament, Debra Bell, Mark Blanche, Jr, Robert Botterill, Chandra Brooks, Brandon Bulger, Scott T. Clark, Dolores Cunninghma, Rebecca Doolin, Tenika Imaku, Amanda Ivanoff, B J Jones, Sarah Kingery, Luane Lagreca, Shannon McFarland, Tony McLemore, Amy Metzinger, Suhel Nazario, Keisha Nelson, Jacob Quill, Deborah Reynolds, Christy Rooker, Makahla Rutledge, Timothy E. Sherer, Brian Slafter, Brian Slafter, Nancy Stockwell, Nikole Sutton, Valerie Tayler, Danielle Thomas, Lynette Wakefield, Shawntrell Washington, Celia Williams, Justin Marc Williams. (Reichenbach, Gregory)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CL Products International, LLC, Candle-Lite Company, LLC, Luminex Home Decor and Fragrance Company, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (eh)
November 9, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CL Products International, LLC, Candle-Lite Company, LLC, Luminex Home Decor and Fragrance Company, LLC, Walmart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7744213), filed by Amanda Ivanoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Walmart Inc., #3 Summons Form CL Products International, LLC, #4 Summons Form Candle-Lite Company, LLC, #5 Summons Form Luminex Home Dcor and Fragrance Company, LLC) (Reichenbach, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanoff v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: In Son J. Loving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CL Products International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luminex Home Decor and Fragrance Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candle-Lite Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ivanoff
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bulger
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott T. Clark
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Williams
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ament
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Blanche, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon McFarland
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawntrell Washington
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy E. Sherer
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Reynolds
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Quill
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Marc Williams
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenika Imaku
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Cunninghma
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Bell
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Slafter
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B J Jones
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Stockwell
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Rooker
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Doolin
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Metzinger
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikole Sutton
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makahla Rutledge
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Tayler
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Botterill
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Brooks
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhel Nazario
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luane Lagreca
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Wakefield
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Thomas
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Kingery
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony McLemore
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Nelson
Represented By: Gregory S Reichenbach
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Eric Scott Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?