Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pierson et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: The Chalet Bar LLC and Victoria Pierson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00897
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Victoria Pierson. Victoria Pierson served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (bjc)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Chalet Bar LLC. The Chalet Bar LLC served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (kl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Victoria Pierson, The Chalet Bar LLC. (eh)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp) Modified on 11/12/2020 (eh).
November 9, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7744322), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form The Chalet Bar LLC, #3 Summons Form Victoria Pierson) (Koberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pierson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chalet Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?