Riordan v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Kelley Riordan
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv00907
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Kelley Riordan. (Bruce, Matthew)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint of Plaintiff filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Goico, Allison)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/12/20. (ba)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 10/6/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2003542) by Kelley Riordan against U.S. Bank National Association. (eh)
November 12, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley Geiler for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Geiler, Hayley)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Goico, Allison)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2003542 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7749182), filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Goico, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riordan v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Riordan
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Allison L Goico
Represented By: Hayley Geiler
Represented By: Allison Louise Goico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?