Carpenter v. Kohl's Department Stores Long-Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Gloria A Carpenter
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Kohl's Department Stores Long-Term Disability Plan and Kohl's Department Store Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00909
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 1/26/2021 at 11:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Counsel shall jointly prepare the Rule 26(f) report using the Court's form. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/judge-timothy-s-black-standing-orders. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/29/2020. (rrs)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Srsic, Daniel)
December 8, 2020 Reset Deadlines re doc. #6 : Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 12/28/2020. (eh)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Srsic, Daniel)
December 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Gloria A Carpenter (Perez, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kohl's Department Store Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan. Kohl's Department Store Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan served on 11/14/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Perez, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Perez, Robert)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Store Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. (eh)
November 12, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7749905), filed by Gloria A Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Form Kohl's Department Stores Long-Term Disability Plan, #3 Summons Form Life Insurance Company of North America) (Perez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Kohl's Department Stores Long-Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria A Carpenter
Represented By: Robert Armand Perez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Store Inc. Long-Term Disability Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?