Brune v. K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary M. Brune
Defendant: K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P. and K Investment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00948
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/15/2021; Steven Coffaro and Taylor Trout appeared for plaintiff; Brian Coulter appeared for defendants; parties to confer regarding any potential early intervention and follow up for a Status Conference set 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 12/22/20 for conferencing instructions. (ba)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CALENDAR ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 2/15/2021. Motions directed to pleadings due by 3/1/2021. Status Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 5/7/2021. Defendant Primary Expert due by 6/7/2021. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 8/1/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/7/2021. Discovery (Expert) due by 9/3/2021. Discovery (Fact) due by 5/3/2021. Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2021. Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2021. Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury trial 4/2022. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/22/20. (ba)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Rosemary M. Brune. (Coffaro, Steven)
November 30, 2020 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/21/2020. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Coulter, Brian)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant K Investment Group, Inc.. (Coulter, Brian)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 10/21/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2003706) by Rosemary M. Brune against K Investment Group, Inc., K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-D) (eh)
November 23, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P.. (Coulter, Brian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant K Investment Group, Inc.. (Coulter, Brian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 2003706 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7766521), filed by K Investment Group, Inc., K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Coulter, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brune v. K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Investments Limited of Ohio, L.P.
Represented By: Brian A. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary M. Brune
Represented By: Taylor Trout
Represented By: Steven C Coffaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?