Blanton v. Barclays Bank Delaware et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Blanton
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00950
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Barclays Bank Delaware answer due 1/21/21. (sct)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Barclays Bank Delaware, Barclays PLC, Barclays Group US Inc, Barclays US LLC, Barclays Bank PLC identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc, Other Affiliate Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays US LLC for Barclays Bank Delaware.. (Joseph, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware. (Joseph, John)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, And Affirmative And Additional Defenses filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Rang, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Trans Union, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union, LLC, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Rang, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Rang for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Rang, Laura)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware. Barclays Bank Delaware served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Widman, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC. Trans Union, LLC served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Widman, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank Delaware, Trans Union, LLC. (kh)
November 24, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7772885), filed by Jerry Blanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Settlement Letter, #2 Exhibit Exh B - Proof of Payments, #3 Exhibit Exh C - April Credit Report, #4 Exhibit Exh D - FCRA Dispute, #5 Exhibit Exh E - Nov Credit Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Form Summons - BBD, #8 Summons Form Summons - Trans Union) (Widman, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton v. Barclays Bank Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Blanton
Represented By: Thomas Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: John E. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Laura K Rang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?