Simply Southern Holdings, LLC v. Tracy Bennington
Plaintiff: SIMPLY SOUTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: TRACY BENNINGTON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00957
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Tracy Bennington on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Cole, Stacy)
November 25, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Matthew Schultz for Plaintiff SIMPLY SOUTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC (Schultz, Frank)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff SIMPLY SOUTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC. (Cole, Stacy)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against TRACY BENNINGTON ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7783363), filed by SIMPLY SOUTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Trademark Registrations) (Cole, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simply Southern Holdings, LLC v. Tracy Bennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BENNINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMPLY SOUTHERN HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Frank Matthew Schultz
Represented By: Stacy A Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?