Findley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donna M Findley
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Performant Recovery, Inc., Alex Azar, David M DeVillers and Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00978
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Goldschmidt for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Goldschmidt, Jason)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Harrison for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Harrison, Gregory)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Executed Summons and USPS Tracking) (Taylor, Ronald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Executed Summons and USPS Tracking) (Taylor, Ronald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Executed Summons and USPS Tracking) (Taylor, Ronald)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Performant Recovery, Inc., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (eh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Proposed Summon Forms, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form) (Taylor, Ronald)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Donna M Findley Civil Cover Sheet (Taylor, Ronald)
December 4, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7817386), filed by Donna M Findley. (Taylor, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Findley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Findley
Represented By: Ronald Coleman Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Jason R Goldschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performant Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M DeVillers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?