Altair Logix LLC v. Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Defendant: Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00128
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 5/24/2021. by Defendant Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cole, Stacy)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaints. Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise plead by 4/23/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/26/21. (sct)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, New date requested 4/23/2021. by Defendant Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cole, Stacy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy A Cole for Defendant Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. (Cole, Stacy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 USPS Tracking) (kh)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David R. Bennett as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efilingthrough PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/5/2021. (eh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8191031) of David R. Bennett by Plaintiff Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing) (Wernow, Howard)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bjc)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. (kh)
February 24, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Altair Logix LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8152299), filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6289434, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altair Logix LLC v. Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exor Electronic Research and Development, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy A Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?