Parks et al v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Erica Parks and Daniel T. Durgin
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00258
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss In Favor of First-Filed Class Action filed by Plaintiffs Daniel T. Durgin, Erica Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Roussel v. Pro Teeth) (Flick, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William B. Federman as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 6/3/2021. (eh)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Erica Parks. Certificate of Good Standing from the Oklahoma Supreme Court. (Flick, Brian)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William B. Federman. The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Deficiency Deadline by 6/10/2021. (eh)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8332448) of William B. Federman by Plaintiff Erica Parks. (Flick, Brian)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss In Favor of First-Filed Class Action by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Housey Complaint) (Combs, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Liu for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company (Combs, Eric) Modified docket text on 5/25/2021 (eh).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Soukup as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 5/18/2021. (eh)
May 18, 2021 Deadline set: Defendant P&G's first-to-file motion due by 05/24/2021. (kaf)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: Upon consideration and for good cause, the Court GRANTS Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company's #5 motion to stay deadline to respond to the complaint until a decision on forthcoming first-to-file motion. Accordingly, Defendant P&G shall file its first-to-file motion by May 24, 2021. The parties shall abide by the deadlines for motions laid out in the Southern District of Ohio's Local Rules. Furthermore, Defendant P&G shall file its response to the complaint 30 days after the Court rules on the first-to-file motion. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/18/2021. (kaf)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8316337) of Andrew Soukup by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. (Combs, Eric)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Until a Decision on Forthcoming First-to-File Motion by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Housey Complaint) (Combs, Eric)
April 28, 2021 Reset Deadlines re doc. #4 : The Procter & Gamble Company answer due 5/24/2021. (eh)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. (Combs, Eric)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company. The Procter & Gamble Company served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Flick, Brian)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Procter & Gamble Company. (eh)
April 14, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Procter & Gamble Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8264801), filed by Erica Parks, Daniel T. Durgin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks et al v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Parks
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Durgin
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Eric Kendall Combs
Represented By: Henry B Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?