United States of America v. One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Browning, Model Light 12, 12-Gauge Shotgun, Serial No. G3 18188, 1966 Chevrolet Chevy II, VIN: 113116W156511, with All Attachments Thereon, One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency, et al., Sig Sauer 7.62 / .308 Rifle, Serial No. 22P127680, with Drum Magazine, Sight Mark Scope, and HiLight Laser Light Combo (Green Dot), H&R, Model 622, .22 Caliber Revolver, Serial No. AB42033, 2002 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, VIN: 1HD1PEV172Y951152, with All Attachments Thereon, Ruger 9mm American Pistol with serial number removed, Smith & Wesson M&P Bodyguard .38 Caliber Handgun, Serial No. KFA9031, Ruger LC9 Pistol, Serial No. 452-29171, Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 1176, in the Name of Custom Interiors LLC, 1969 Chevrolet Camaro Z-28, VIN: 124379N522176, with All Attachments Thereon, 2015 BMW M235i Convertible, VIN: WBA1M1C51FV393120, with All Attachments Thereon, 1964 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 40837S105527, with All Attachments Thereon, Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 4360, in the Name of Showtime Talent Productions, Winchester, Model 94 Rifle, Serial No. 2383600, 2003 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 1G1YY32G335112993, with All Attachments Thereon, Winchester, Model 37, 12-Gauge Shotgun with no serial number, Four Thousand, Eight Hundred Forty Dollars and 00/100 ($4,840.00) in United States Currency, Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 7298, in the Names of P. Scott and Carol Clendenin, One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency, 1964 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 40837S105527, 1966 Chevrolet Chevy II, VIN: 113116W156511, 1969 Chevrolet Camaro Z-28, VIN: 124379N522176, 2002 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, VIN: 1HD1PEV172Y951152, 2003 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 1G1YY32G335112993 and 2015 BMW M235i Convertible, VIN: WBA1M1C51FV393120
Case Number: 1:2021cv00316
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/9/2021. (rrs)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Grimes, Deborah)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re 2 Seizure Warrant Issued Process Receipts and Returns (Grimes, Deborah)
May 11, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning, Model Light 12, 12-Gauge Shotgun, Serial No. G3 18188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1966 Chevrolet Chevy II, VIN: 113116W156511, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer 7.62 / .308 Rifle, Serial No. 22P127680, with Drum Magazine, Sight Mark Scope, and HiLight Laser Light Combo (Green Dot)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R, Model 622, .22 Caliber Revolver, Serial No. AB42033
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2002 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, VIN: 1HD1PEV172Y951152, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 9mm American Pistol with serial number removed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson M&P Bodyguard .38 Caliber Handgun, Serial No. KFA9031
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger LC9 Pistol, Serial No. 452-29171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 1176, in the Name of Custom Interiors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1969 Chevrolet Camaro Z-28, VIN: 124379N522176, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 BMW M235i Convertible, VIN: WBA1M1C51FV393120, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1964 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 40837S105527, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 4360, in the Name of Showtime Talent Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester, Model 94 Rifle, Serial No. 2383600
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2003 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 1G1YY32G335112993, with All Attachments Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester, Model 37, 12-Gauge Shotgun with no serial number
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Thousand, Eight Hundred Forty Dollars and 00/100 ($4,840.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Peoples Bank, Account No. ending in 7298, in the Names of P. Scott and Carol Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Sixty-Two Thousand, Eight Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and 00/100 ($162,868.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1964 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 40837S105527
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1966 Chevrolet Chevy II, VIN: 113116W156511
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1969 Chevrolet Camaro Z-28, VIN: 124379N522176
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2002 Harley Davidson Motorcycle, VIN: 1HD1PEV172Y951152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2003 Chevrolet Corvette, VIN: 1G1YY32G335112993
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 BMW M235i Convertible, VIN: WBA1M1C51FV393120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?