Worsham v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anna Worsham
Defendant: Anthony Chaney, Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. and Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Case Number: 1:2021cv00331
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 7/16/2021. Motions directed to pleadings due by 7/30/2021. Motions to Amend due by 8/13/2021. Lay Witness due by 2/28/2022. Primary Expert due by 3/31/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/29/2022. Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2023 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Timothy S. Black. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Cincinnati before Judge Timothy S. Black. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/21/2021. (rrs)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for a preliminary pretrial conference by telephone on 6/21/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Evan McFarland appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Natalie McLaughlin appeared on behalf of Defendants. A Calendar Order shall issue by separate entry. The parties shall notify the Court of the date of Plaintiff's deposition, either via filing a notice of deposition or a joint email to Chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/21/2021. (rrs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthony Chaney. (McLaughlin, Natalie)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/21/2021 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Counsel shall jointly prepare the Rule 26(f) report using the Court's form. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/judge-timothy-s-black-standing-orders. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/21/2021. (rrs)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthony Chaney. (Stevens, Janay)
May 17, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Court SUA SPONTE TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio Western Division at the Cincinnati location. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 14, 2021. (jlk)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendants Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthony Chaney Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Stevens, Janay)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendants Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthony Chaney of Civil Cover Sheet (Stevens, Janay)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 4/8/2021 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2101222) by Anna Worsham against Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthony Chaney, . (daf) Modified docket text on 5/17/2021 (eh).
May 14, 2021 Case transferred in from Eastern Division Division on 05/14/2021 Case Number 2:21-cv-2481. Case assigned to Judge Timothy S. Black. (jlk)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, case number A2101222 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8311535), filed by Anthony Chaney, Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court) (Stevens, Janay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worsham v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Chaney
Represented By: Janay Marie Stevens
Represented By: Natalie M McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Janay Marie Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: Janay Marie Stevens
Represented By: Natalie M McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Worsham
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?