Vivanco v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Alim Vivanco
Defendant: Diane McConnell, John Geoghan, Barbara Gardner-Evants and Management & Training Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00333
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendants Barbara Gardner-Evants, Management & Training Corp. of Service of Defendants Management & Training Corp. and Barbara Gardner-Evans' Initial Disclosures (Smith, Kenneth)
June 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 6/29/2021; Matthew Bruce appeared for Plaintiff Alim Vivanco; David Andrews appeared for Defendants John Geoghan and Diane McConnell; and Amy Kullik appeared for Defendants Management & Training Corp. and Barbara Gardner-Evants; follow-up Status Conference scheduled for 8/18/21 at 11:30 AM. (Status Conference set for 8/18/2021 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett.) (kh)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CALENDAR ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 7/16/2021. Motions directed to pleadings due by 7/23/2021. Status Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 10/1/2021. Defendant Primary Expert due by 11/2/2021. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 1/24/2022. Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2022. Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 01:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 01:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury trial 9/2022. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/11/21. (ba)
June 10, 2021 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 7] Rule 26(f) Report - restricted for filing error. See doc. #8 Rule 26(f) Report for corrected entry. (eh)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Alim Vivanco. (Bruce, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 [FORMER DOC. 7 - PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCUMENT UNSIGNED.] RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Alim Vivanco. (Bruce, Matthew) Modified docket text and document security on 6/10/2021 (eh).
May 19, 2021 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/9/2021. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #3 Complaint originally filed 5/15/2021 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2101301) by John Geoghan. (eh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #3 Complaint originally filed 5/15/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2101301) by Diane McConnell. (eh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #3 Complaint originally filed 5/13/2021 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2101301) by Barbara Gardner-Evants, Management & Training Corp. (eh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 4/14/2021 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2101301) by Alim Vivanco against All Defendants. (eh)
May 18, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendants John Geoghan, Diane McConnell re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Andrews, David)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2101301 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8315450), filed by Barbara Gardner-Evants, Management & Training Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, Notice of Dismissal, Answers, #4 Exhibit B - Docket) (Smith, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivanco v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane McConnell
Represented By: David T. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Geoghan
Represented By: David T. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Gardner-Evants
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Represented By: Amy L. Kullik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Represented By: Amy L. Kullik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alim Vivanco
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?