Feagan et al v. The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Eric C Deters, Glenn Feagan and Deters Law Firm PC II
Defendant: The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio, Kelli C. Schmidt, Donald Holtz and Joseph Caligiuri
Case Number: 1:2021cv00399
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio. (Yackshaw, Ann)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew David McCartney for Defendants Joseph Caligiuri, Donald Holtz, Kelli C. Schmidt, The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio (McCartney, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Yackshaw for Defendants Joseph Caligiuri, Donald Holtz, Kelli C. Schmidt, The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio (Yackshaw, Ann)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, Costs, And Attorney Fees For Constitutional Violations against All Defendants, filed by Glenn Feagan, Deters Law Firm PC II, Eric C Deters. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Maraan, Benjamin)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Joseph Caligiuri, The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio. Joseph Caligiuri served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021; The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (kl)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Donald Holtz, Kelli C. Schmidt. Donald Holtz served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021; Kelli C. Schmidt served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (bjc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) (bjc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Caligiuri, Donald Holtz, Kelli C. Schmidt, The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio. (eh)
June 14, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8358567), filed by Glenn Feagan, Deters Law Firm PC II, Eric C Deters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feagan et al v. The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office Of The Ohio Disciplinary Counsel For The Supreme Court Of The State Of Ohio
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Represented By: Andrew David McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli C. Schmidt
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Represented By: Andrew David McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Holtz
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Represented By: Andrew David McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Caligiuri
Represented By: Ann Yackshaw
Represented By: Andrew David McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C Deters
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Feagan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deters Law Firm PC II
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?