Triller Fight Club II, LLC v. Swords
Plaintiff: Triller Fight Club II, LLC
Defendant: Jerren Swords
Case Number: 1:2021cv00401
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/5/21. (ba)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Brendon Gura as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/25/2021. (eh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8374027) of Alexander Brendon Gura by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Farhad Novian; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Jason O'Brien as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/22/2021. (eh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8366823) of Michael Jason OBrien by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8366810) of Farhad Novian by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jerren Swords. Jerren Swords served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II, LLC. (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jerren Swords. (eh)
June 14, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II, LLC - Report (AO121) on Filing of an Action Involving Copyright (Chudakoff, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jerren Swords ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8359172), filed by Triller Fight Club II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unofficial copy of Certificate of Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Public Comment Admission on Instagram, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Public Comment Admission on Instagram, #4 Summons Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chudakoff, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triller Fight Club II, LLC v. Swords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerren Swords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triller Fight Club II, LLC
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Paul Jason Linden
Represented By: Alexander Brendon Gura
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Michael Jason O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?