Dunn v. Select Employment Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamie Dunn
Defendant: Select Employment Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00454
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Renay Carden for Plaintiff Jamie Dunn (Carden, Brianna)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CALENDAR ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 10/29/2021. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 2/3/2022. Defendant Primary Expert due by 4/5/2022. Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2022. Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial dates will be set at a later date by Judge Dlott pursuant to her case management schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/17/2021. (art)
August 17, 2021 Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for a Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 8/17/2021. Counsel for plaintiff and for defendant present. Case calendar established. Order of the Court to follow. Case set for a follow-up status conference before MJ Litkovitz via telephone on 11/8/2021 at 3:00 pm. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT Of The Parties by Plaintiff Jamie Dunn. (Bruce, Matthew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26f Meeting Report due to be filed by by 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/14/2021. (art)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Select Employment Services, Inc., Select Medical Corporation, Select Medical Holding Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Corporation, Corporate Parent Select Medical Holding Corporation for Select Employment Services, Inc... (Pryor, Patricia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Select Employment Services, Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/9/2021. (eh)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief with JURY DEMAND against Select Employment Services, Inc., originally filed on 06/03/2021 in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court (Case No. A2101901) by Jamie Dunn. (kh)
July 8, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2101901 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8392330), filed by Select Employment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pryor, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Select Employment Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Dunn
Represented By: Brianna Renay Carden
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Employment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Represented By: Alessandro Botta Blondet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?