Jordan Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jordan Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00534
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this action to the Southern District of Ohio, Eastern Division at Columbus, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/23/2021. (km)
August 23, 2021 Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Eastern Division at Columbus as case number 2:21-cv-04216. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:21-cv-04216. (km)
August 19, 2021 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** Set Deadline: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/18/2021. (kh) Modified on 8/20/2021 (kh).
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Stephanie Jordan Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit SSA Form) (Wilson, Rachel) Modified on 8/19/2021 (kh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jordan Smith
Represented By: Rachel C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?