Cohen et al v. hughes et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Cohen and david cohen
Defendant: duane hughes, Steve schrader, Robert Willison, Raymond Chess, Gerald Budde, Harry Demott, Michael Clark, Jacqueline Dedo, Pamela Mader, Benjamin Samuels, Raymond J. Chess, Gerald B. Budde, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels and Workhorse Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00601
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:21-cv-08734, filed 11/05/2021. (er)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting transfer to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/5/2021. (rrs)
November 5, 2021 Case transferred to Central District of California.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (rrs)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER granting extension of time for Defendants to move or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2021. (rrs)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Stipulation re Transfer and Initial Pleading Matters by Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sayre, Russell)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/30/2021. (eh)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8519584) of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. Esq. by Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Member of Good Standing) (Connick, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Workhorse Group, Inc.. Workhorse Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Connick, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Herzig, Aaron)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Sayre, Russell)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/22/2021. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (eh)
September 22, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form to Clark, #2 Summons Form to Dedo, #3 Summons Form to Demott, #4 Summons Form to Hughes, #5 Summons Form to Mader, #6 Summons Form to Samuels, #7 Summons Form to Schrader, #8 Summons Form to Willison, #9 Summons Form to Workhorse) (Connick, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Def Budde (Connick, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gerald Budde, Raymond Chess, Michael Clark, Jacqueline Dedo, Harry Demott, Pamela Mader, Benjamin Samuels, Robert Willison, duane hughes, Steve schrader ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8505654), filed by david cohen, Daniel Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit b - Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter) (Connick, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cohen
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: david cohen
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: duane hughes
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve schrader
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Willison
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Chess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Budde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Demott
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Dedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Mader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Chess
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald B. Budde
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Clark
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline A. Dedo
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Mader
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Benjamin Samuels
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workhorse Group, Inc.
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?