Patrick v. Tire Discounters, Inc
Plaintiff: William Patrick
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00629
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Tire Discounters, Inc. (Lewis, Colleen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Hilliard for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Hilliard, Jason)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joseph Stephens, III for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Stephens, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen P Lewis for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Lewis, Colleen)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. Tire Discounters, Inc served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (bjc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kh)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tire Discounters, Inc. (kh)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:21-cv-617, 1:21-cv-618, 1:21-cv-619, 1:21-cv-620, 1:21-cv-621, 1:21-cv-627, 1:21-cv-628, 1:21-cv-616, 1:21-cv-630, 1:21-cv-631, 1:21-cv-632, 1:21-cv-633, and 1:21-cv-634 are related. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 10/07/2021. (bjc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff William Patrick of Related Case (Legando, Drew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tire Discounters, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8519117), filed by William Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Legando, Drew)
September 29, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Tire Discounters, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Patrick
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc
Represented By: Colleen P Lewis
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Stephens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?