Dawan v. Kenton Court Detention Center
Plaintiff: Yusuf Mujahid Dawan and Daniel Joseph Williams
Defendant: Kenton Court Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2021cv00698
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2021 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Eastern District of Kentucky as case 2:21-cv-00151, filed 11/19/2021. (er)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The Clerk of Courts is hereby DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/19/2021. (km)
November 19, 2021 Case transferred to the District of Eastern District of Kentucky (Covington). Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (km)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenton Court Detention Center, filed by Yusuf Mujahid Dawan (Scanned as Received Without Summons Forms, USM-285 Forms, Civil Cover Sheet, IFP Form, or Filing Fee). (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 11/8/2021 (bjc). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/8/2021) (bjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawan v. Kenton Court Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yusuf Mujahid Dawan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Court Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?