Cassidy v. Adams County et al
Plaintiff: Leo Cassidy
Defendant: Adams County, Adams County Prosecutor and Judge Brett Spencer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00783
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 2/22/2022, why Defendants' motions to dismiss #2 #7 should not be construed as unopposed and granted for the reasons stated. Plaintiff may also satisfy the requirements of this Order by filing responsive memoranda to Defendants' motions by the 2/22/2022 deadline. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in a Report and Recommendation to the District Judge that the pending motion be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/31/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda L Woeber for Defendant Brett Spencer (Woeber, Linda)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Cooper D. Bowen for Defendant Brett Spencer (Woeber, Linda) Modified docket text on 12/22/2021 (kh).
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brett Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Adams County Common Pleas Court Record Search) (Woeber, Linda)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Adams County, Adams County Prosecutor, Brett Spencer, originally filed on 11/17/2021 in Adams County Common Pleas Court (Case No. 2021-0407) by Leo Cassidy. (kh)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Adams County re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint (Moser, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Adams County, Adams County Prosecutor. (Moser, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Adams County, case number 2021-0407 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8642656), filed by Brett Spencer, Adams County Prosecutor, Adams County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Moser, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy v. Adams County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Represented By: David C. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Prosecutor
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Represented By: David C. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brett Spencer
Represented By: Cooper D Bowen
Represented By: Linda L Woeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?