Comer v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Robert S Comer
Defendant: Warden's Assist Brian Baker, Warden's Clerk Tyra Parker, R.I.B. Chairman Officer Miller, Chief legal Counsel Vencot Brown, Brian Baker, Tyra Parker, Officer Miller and Vencot Brown
Case Number: 1:2021cv00799
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Complaint filed by Robert S Comer. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Plaintiff's complaint, as amended, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1); (2) The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/20/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Brian Baker, Vencot Brown, Officer Miller, Tyra Parker, filed by Robert S Comer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering the collection of the full filing fee pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) and the terms set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/20/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/Letter by Plaintiff Robert S Comer. (kh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Robert S Comer (kh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Robert S. Comer. (A Civil Cover Sheet was not submitted to the Office of the Clerk. Copies of the Complaint, Summons and USM-285 were submitted.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope) (bjc) Modified on 12/30/2021 to clarify receipt of summons and USM forms (kl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comer v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden's Assist Brian Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden's Clerk Tyra Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.I.B. Chairman Officer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief legal Counsel Vencot Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vencot Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?