Blair v. Saint Lucie Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Delfon Blair, r
Defendant: Saint Lucie Police Department and Fort Piercer Courthouse Judges
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 2:22-cv-14019, filed 01/13/2022. (sem)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/13/2022. The Clerk of Courts is hereby DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 13, 2022 Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (eh)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Copies of the Complaint; Summons and USM-285 Forms for Defendant Fort Piercer Courthouse Judges) by Plaintiff Delfon Blair, r. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 USM-285 Form) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Saint Lucie Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfon Blair, r
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Lucie Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Piercer Courthouse Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?