West v. Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reuben West
Defendant: Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., Best Pizza, LLC, DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc., TGD Food Group, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc., MaryLu Weaver, John Doe 1-10 and Doe Corporation 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00007
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8755817) of Sarah Nirenberg by Defendant Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
March 4, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8755744) of Rebecca S. Davies by Defendant Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 24, 2022 Filing 34 CORRECTED Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Defendants Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc. TGD Food Group, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc. and Marylu Weaver filed by Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 24, 2022 Notice of Correction re: #33 Answer to Complaint, the filer contacted the Clerk's Office and indicated that this filing was incomplete. This filing has been restricted at the request of the filer and will be re-filed. (bjc)
February 23, 2022 Filing 33 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Defendants Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc. TGD Food Group, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc. and Marylu Weaver filed by Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence) Modified Docket Text and Security on 2/24/2022 (bjc).
February 17, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley Edward Kane for Plaintiff Reuben West (Kane, Riley)
February 9, 2022 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Best Pizza, LLC, MaryLu Weaver. (Elswick, Samuel)
February 9, 2022 Filing 30 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #29 Summons Returned Executed, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #29 Summons Returned Executed as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/10/2022. (kh)
February 8, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Best Pizza, LLC, MaryLu Weaver. Best Pizza, LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022; MaryLu Weaver served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (Elswick, Samuel)
February 4, 2022 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Milford Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Weaver Dream Team, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sandeaver, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Symmes Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DW & KV Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 4, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TGD Food Group, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 21 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, documents #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 and #20 Corporate Disclosure Statements, filed by Symmes Pizza, DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc., TGD Food Group, Inc., Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc. and Milford Pizza, Inc., and it appears that the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore are not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile documents 14-20, linking the documents back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/4/2022. (kl)
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Weaver Dream Team, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TGD Food Group, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Symmes Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sandeaver, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Milford Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DW & KV Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 3, 2022 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Symmes Pizza, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sandeaver, Inc., #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Weaver Dream Team, Inc., #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Milford Pizza, Inc., #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by TGD Food Group, Inc., #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DW & KV Pizza, Inc.., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Symmes Pizza, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sandeaver, Inc., #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Weaver Dream Team, Inc., #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Milford Pizza, Inc., #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by TGD Food Group, Inc., #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DW & KV Pizza, Inc.. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/4/2022. (bjc)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Weaver Dream Team, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TGD Food Group, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Symmes Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sandeaver, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Milford Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DW & KV Pizza, Inc.. (Miglio, Terrence)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Miglio, Terrence)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc., TGD Food Group, Inc., Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc.. DW & KV Pizza, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Milford Pizza, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Sandeaver, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Symmes Pizza, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; TGD Food Group, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022; Weaver Dream Team, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. (Elswick, Samuel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Best Pizza, LLC, DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc., TGD Food Group, Inc., Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., MaryLu Weaver, Weaver Dream Team, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form) (ds)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., Best Pizza, LLC, DW & KV Pizza, Inc., Milford Pizza, Inc., Sandeaver, Inc., Symmes Pizza, Inc., TGD Food Group, Inc., Weaver Dream Team, Inc., and MaryLu Weaver. (kl)
January 6, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Class and Collective Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8660870), filed by Reuben West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form, #3 Summons Form to Best Pizza, LLC, #4 Summons Form to DW & KV Pizza, Inc., #5 Summons Form to MaryLu Weaver, #6 Summons Form to Milford Pizza, Inc., #7 Summons Form to Sandeaver, Inc., #8 Summons Form to Symmes Pizza, Inc., #9 Summons Form to TGD Food Group, Inc., #10 Summons Form to Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc., #11 Summons Form to Weaver Dream Team, Inc.) (Elswick, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben West
Represented By: Samuel David Elswick, Jr
Represented By: Riley Edward Kane
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Represented By: Andy Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unlimited Potential Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DW & KV Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeaver, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symmes Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGD Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver Dream Team, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryLu Weaver
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?